MI SB0589 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0350'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0350'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; signs; existing sign structures; allow interim permits. Amends sec. 7a of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.307a).
Title
Highways; signs; existing sign structures; allow interim permits. Amends sec. 7a of 1972 PA 106 (MCL 252.307a).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0350'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 1:12 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/21/2010 @ 3:10 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:45 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-02 | Title Amended | |
2010-12-03 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-03 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-12-03 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-03 | Roll Call # 648 Yeas 19 Nays 13 Excused 4 Not Voting 1 | |
2010-12-03 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2010-12-03 | House Amended Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 Yeas 68 Nays 30 | |
2010-12-02 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-12-01 | Postponed Temporarily | |
2010-12-01 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Amended | |
2010-12-01 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-11-30 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2009-09-09 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-09-09 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-09 | Received On 09/09/2009 | |
2009-09-09 | Passed Roll Call # 442 Yeas 23 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-08-27 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-08-27 | Substitute S-2 Concurred In | |
2009-08-27 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-08-19 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-08-19 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-08-19 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-05-20 | Referred To Committee On Transportation |