MI SB0586 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Weapons; other; local units of government prohibited from imposing certain restrictions on firearms; expand. Amends secs. 1 & 2 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 & 123.1102).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons; other; local units of government prohibited from imposing certain restrictions on firearms; expand. Amends secs. 1 & 2 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 & 123.1102).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 457 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-11-09HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-09HouseReceived On 11/08/2017
2017-11-08SenatePassed Roll Call # 457 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-11-08SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-11-08SenateRules Suspended
2017-11-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-11-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-11-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-11-08SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-11-08SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-09-20SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2017-09-20SenateIntroduced By Senator Mike Shirkey

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback