MI SB0578 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned Pa 00045'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned Pa 00045'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recreation; other; statewide trail network and right to ride horses on certain lands; establish. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding secs. 72114 & 72115. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4610'09
Title
Recreation; other; statewide trail network and right to ride horses on certain lands; establish. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding secs. 72114 & 72115. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4610'09
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] | Sen. Cameron Brown [R] | Sen. Alan Cropsey [R] | Sen. Wayne Kuipers [R] |
Sen. Alan Sanborn [R] | Sen. Tony Stamas [R] | Sen. Gerald Van Woerkom [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Assigned Pa 00045'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-04-13 | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/2/2010 @ 11:44 Am | |
2010-04-13 | Approved By Governor 4/1/2010 @ 3:00 Pm | |
2010-04-13 | Presented To Governor 3/30/2010 @ 3:24 Pm | |
2010-03-25 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-03-25 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-03-25 | Roll Call # 175 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-03-25 | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In | |
2010-03-25 | Title Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Title Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 119 Yeas 107 Nays 2 | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-01-26 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-01-26 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-12-17 | Read A First Time | |
2009-12-17 | Received On 12/17/2009 | |
2009-12-17 | Passed Roll Call # 728 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-12-17 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-17 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-6 | |
2009-12-17 | Substitute S-6 Concurred In | |
2009-12-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-6 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitutes S-2 And S-5 | |
2009-12-17 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-17 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 | |
2009-12-17 | Committee Recommended Rejection Of Substitute S-2 Previously Recommended By Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs | |
2009-11-18 | Referred To Committee On Agriculture And Bioeconomy | |
2009-11-18 | Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Agriculture And Bioeconomy With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-05-14 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Natural resources, other
Recreation, other
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources
Recreation, other
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources