MI SB0513 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Assigned Pa 0021'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Assigned Pa 0021'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; renaming a bridge on US-10; designate as the "Corpsman Aaron D. Ullom Memorial Bridge". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 3a.
Title
Highways; name; renaming a bridge on US-10; designate as the "Corpsman Aaron D. Ullom Memorial Bridge". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 3a.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 552 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 552 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0021'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/23/2016 @ 4:10 Pm |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 2/23/2016 @ 3:33 Pm |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 2/12/2016 @ 10:06 Am |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-02-09 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-08 | House | Received On 12/08/2015 |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 552 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |