MI SB0468 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Presented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:36 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Children; services; placement in a qualified residential treatment program; provide regulations for. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 13a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0469'19, SB 0467'19, SB 0466'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; services; placement in a qualified residential treatment program; provide regulations for. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 13a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0469'19, SB 0467'19, SB 0466'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 8 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 248 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenatePresented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:36 Am
2020-01-09SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-01-09SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-01-08HouseReturned To Senate
2020-01-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 8 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-01-08HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-11-06HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-10-16HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2019-10-16HouseRead A First Time
2019-10-16HouseReceived On 10/16/2019
2019-10-16SenatePassed Roll Call # 248 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-10-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-08SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-10-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-09-17SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-09-17SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-09-17SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-08-29SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
2019-08-29SenateIntroduced By Senator John Bizon, M.d.

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback