MI SB0447 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Assigned Pa 0147'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-27 - Assigned Pa 0147'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water; quality; operator certification programs; authorize. Amends sec. 9 of 1976 PA 399 (MCL 325.1009). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0448'11
Title
Water; quality; operator certification programs; authorize. Amends sec. 9 of 1976 PA 399 (MCL 325.1009). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0448'11
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Kahn [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 (Y: 62 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 347 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 347 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0147'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/21/2011 @ 2:20 Pm |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 9/20/2011 @ 3:28 Pm |
2011-09-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 9/13/2011 @ 2:30 Pm |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-09-07 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-08-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-08-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-08-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 312 Yeas 62 Nays 44 |
2011-08-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-08-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-08-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-08-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-08-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-08-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2011-06-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-23 | House | Received On 06/23/2011 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 347 Yeas 31 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |