MI SB0435 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Assigned Pa 0038'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Assigned Pa 0038'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: occupations; definition of designated professional for the Michigan essential health provider recruitment strategy act; expand to include mental health professionals and modify effective date of the repeal of the interstate medical licensure compact. Amends secs. 2701, 2711, 2717 & 16189 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2701 et seq.) & repeals sec. 16189 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16189).
Title
Health: occupations; definition of designated professional for the Michigan essential health provider recruitment strategy act; expand to include mental health professionals and modify effective date of the repeal of the interstate medical licensure compact. Amends secs. 2701, 2711, 2717 & 16189 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2701 et seq.) & repeals sec. 16189 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16189).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 61 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 93 (Y: 97 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 231 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 93 (Y: 97 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 231 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0038'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/23/2022 10:44 Am |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 03/23/2022 09:41 Am |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 03/10/2022 11:42 Am |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrollment Vacated |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 61 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Title Amended |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 93 Yeas 97 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-02 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-05-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-27 | House | Received On 05/27/2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 231 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael D. Macdonald |
Subjects
Health occupations: mental health care professionals
Health: occupations
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: occupations
State agencies (existing): health and human services