MI SB0354 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-14 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-14 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sex offender registration; exception to prohibition against residing within a student safety zone; modify. Amends sec. 35 of 1994 PA 295 (MCL 28.735).
Title
Criminal procedure; sex offender registration; exception to prohibition against residing within a student safety zone; modify. Amends sec. 35 of 1994 PA 295 (MCL 28.735).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 287 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-06-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-14 | House | Received On 06/14/2011 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 287 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |