MI SB0337 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Assigned Pa 0003'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Assigned Pa 0003'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation; administration; claims for credit or refund, audit completion, and successor liability; modify. Amends secs. 21, 27a & 30 of 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.21 et seq.).
Title
Taxation; administration; claims for credit or refund, audit completion, and successor liability; modify. Amends secs. 21, 27a & 30 of 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.21 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 4 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 221 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 4 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 221 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0003'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/6/2014 @ 2:36 Pm |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/30/2014 @ 10:25 Am |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/24/2014 @ 11:04 Am |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 2 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | House Substitute H-4 Concurred In |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-01-16 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2014-01-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-01-15 | House | Title Amended |
2014-01-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 4 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-01-15 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2014-01-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-01-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2014-01-14 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2014-01-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-29 | House | Received On 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 221 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |