MI SB0311 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 0197'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-11 - Assigned Pa 0197'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: absent voters; electronic return of absent voter ballots by military voters using Department of Defense Common Access Cards; allow. Amends sec. 759a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759a) .
Title
Elections: absent voters; electronic return of absent voter ballots by military voters using Department of Defense Common Access Cards; allow. Amends sec. 759a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759a) .
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 302 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0197'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/07/2022 04:52 Pm |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/07/2022 03:32 Pm |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/03/2022 02:30 Pm |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 471 Yeas 30 Nays 1 Excused 6 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2022-09-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-09-28 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 450 Yeas 98 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-09-28 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-24 | House | Received On 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 302 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Defeated |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ruth A. Johnson |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
Subjects
Elections: absent voters
Elections: ballots
Elections: election officials
Elections: voters
Military affairs: other
State agencies (existing): other
Elections: ballots
Elections: election officials
Elections: voters
Military affairs: other
State agencies (existing): other