MI SB0279 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: House Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: House Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: absent voters; absent voter counting boards; modify, and revise number of challengers allowed under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 730 & 764d of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.730 & 168.764d).
Title
Elections: absent voters; absent voter counting boards; modify, and revise number of challengers allowed under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 730 & 764d of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.730 & 168.764d).
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Johnson [R] | Sen. Kimberly LaSata [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Lana Theis [R] |
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] | Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. John Bizon [R] | Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] | Sen. Ricky Outman [R] |
Rep. Curtis VanderWall [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 90 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2022-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-17 | House | Received On 03/17/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 90 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ruth A. Johnson |