MI SB0263 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; records; persons convicted of certain child abuse offenses; require to register under the child abuse offender registry. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0261'17
Title
Criminal procedure; records; persons convicted of certain child abuse offenses; require to register under the child abuse offender registry. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0261'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 735 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 735 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |