MI SB0248 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; coverage and benefits; make miscellaneous changes and create an insurance fraud prevention authority. Amends title & secs. 3101, 3104, 3107, 3107a, 3114, 3135, 3157, 3163, 3301, 3310, 3330, 4501 & 6107 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3101 et seq.) & adds sec. 3107c & ch. 63. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0249'15
Title
Insurance; no-fault; coverage and benefits; make miscellaneous changes and create an insurance fraud prevention authority. Amends title & secs. 3101, 3104, 3107, 3107a, 3114, 3135, 3157, 3163, 3301, 3310, 3330, 4501 & 6107 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3101 et seq.) & adds sec. 3107c & ch. 63. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0249'15
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 101 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 101 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2015-04-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-16 | House | Received On 04/16/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 101 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 As Amended |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Substitute S-3 As Amended Concurred In |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 And Amendment(s) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Joe Hune |