MI SB0174 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0229'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0229'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer credit; credit reports and reporting agencies; security freeze on credit reports concerning other children and consumers; allow under certain circumstance. Creates new act.
Title
Consumer credit; credit reports and reporting agencies; security freeze on credit reports concerning other children and consumers; allow under certain circumstance. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 573 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 468 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 410 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 468 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 410 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0229'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/26/2013 @ 11:34 Am |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:04 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2013 @ 10:28 Am 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-12-11 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 573 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2013-12-10 | House | Re-returned To Senate |
2013-12-10 | House | Passed Roll Call # 468 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2013-12-10 | House | Amended |
2013-12-10 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2013-12-10 | House | Rule Suspended |
2013-12-05 | House | Returned As Requested |
2013-12-04 | House | House Requests Return |
2013-11-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-11-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2013-10-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-16 | House | Received On 10/16/2013 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 410 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |