MI SB0151 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Assigned Pa 0229'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Assigned Pa 0229'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; DNA; filing deadline for petition seeking review of DNA evidence; remove sunset. Amends sec. 16, ch. X of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 770.16).
Title
Criminal procedure; DNA; filing deadline for petition seeking review of DNA evidence; remove sunset. Amends sec. 16, ch. X of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 770.16).
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Bieda [D] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. James Ananich [D] | Sen. Curtis Hertel [D] |
Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] | Sen. Hoon-Yung Hopgood [D] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Vincent Gregory [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 453 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 424 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 424 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0229'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2015 @ 2:31 Pm |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/17/2015 @ 8:56 Am |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/15/2015 @ 11:42 Am |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-12-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-12-08 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2015-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 453 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2015-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-12-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-12-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-10-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-14 | House | Received On 10/14/2015 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 424 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Steven Bieda |