MI SB0090 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0234'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0234'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; collections; use tax on difference between trade-in and purchase price for motor vehicles and titled watercraft; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.92).
Title
Use tax; collections; use tax on difference between trade-in and purchase price for motor vehicles and titled watercraft; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.92).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 601 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 601 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 12 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 601 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 12 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0234'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/26/2013 @ 1:30 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:00 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2013 @ 10:32 Am 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Roll Call # 601 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2013-12-11 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-12-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 Yeas 102 Nays 7 |
2013-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-12-10 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2013-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-11-13 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-05-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-06 | House | Received On 02/06/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 12 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Robertson |