MI SB0080 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; accidents; samples used for chemical analysis; expand to include urine, and expand implied consent under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 625a & 625c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625a & 257.625c).
Title
Traffic control; accidents; samples used for chemical analysis; expand to include urine, and expand implied consent under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 625a & 625c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625a & 257.625c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 42 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Received On 02/28/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 42 Yeas 29 Nays 7 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |