MI SB0076 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0307'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0307'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts: other; certain crime victims; exempt from jury duty and provide that certain individuals are not practicing law in violation of the revised judicature act. Amends secs. 916 & 1307a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.916 & 600.1307a).
Title
Courts: other; certain crime victims; exempt from jury duty and provide that certain individuals are not practicing law in violation of the revised judicature act. Amends secs. 916 & 1307a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.916 & 600.1307a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 502 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 275 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 275 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0307'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 02:26 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 10:38 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 04:23 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2020-12-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-01 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 502 Yeas 102 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-22 | House | Received On 10/22/2019 |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 275 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kimberly Lasata |