MI SB0012 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Assigned Pa 0020'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Assigned Pa 0020'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; state employees; retired state employees to contract with department of attorney general in litigation matters involving this state; allow under certain circumstances without losing retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).
Title
Retirement; state employees; retired state employees to contract with department of attorney general in litigation matters involving this state; allow under certain circumstances without losing retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 108 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 62 (Y: 82 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 7 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 62 (Y: 82 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 7 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0020'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/5/2015 @ 4:08 Pm |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/5/2015 @ 12:36 Pm |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/27/2015 @ 2:27 Pm |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Roll Call # 108 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-04-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2015-04-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 62 Yeas 82 Nays 28 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-04-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Received On 02/03/2015 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 7 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |