MI HJRWW | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-14 - Join Resolution Electronically Reproduced 12/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-14 - Join Resolution Electronically Reproduced 12/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; contributions and expenditures; petition Congress to propose amendments to Constitution to reverse Citizens United; provide for. Creates new joint resolution.
Title
Campaign finance; contributions and expenditures; petition Congress to propose amendments to Constitution to reverse Citizens United; provide for. Creates new joint resolution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Join Resolution Electronically Reproduced 12/13/2016 |
2016-12-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Lauren Plawecki |
Same As/Similar To
SJRS (Same As) 2016-09-07 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Subjects
Campaign finance: contributions and expenditures
Campaign finance: other
Constitutional amendments: federal
Campaign finance: other
Constitutional amendments: federal
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HJR-WW |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/jointresolutionintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIJR-WW.htm |