MI HB6435 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Michigan business tax; credit; credit for installation of charging stations that are available to the public; provide for. Amends sec. 460 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1460).
Title
Michigan business tax; credit; credit for installation of charging stations that are available to the public; provide for. Amends sec. 460 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1460).
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Clemente [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2010-11-09 | Transmitted | |
2010-11-09 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 448 Yeas 65 Nays 39 | |
2010-11-09 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-11-09 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-09 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-11-09 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2010-11-09 | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted | |
2010-11-09 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-09-21 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-09-21 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-09-15 | Printed Bill Filed 09/15/2010 | |
2010-09-14 | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology | |
2010-09-14 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-14 | Introduced By Representative Ed Clemente |