MI HB6401 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Education; employees; performance evaluation systems for school administrators; modify. Amends sec. 1249b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1249b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; employees; performance evaluation systems for school administrators; modify. Amends sec. 1249b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1249b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-10-04HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-09-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2018
2018-09-26HouseReferred To Committee On Education Reform
2018-09-26HouseRead A First Time
2018-09-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Jeff Noble

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback