MI HB6370 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 235'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 235'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property: recording; marketable record title; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 1945 PA 200 (MCL 565.104).
Title
Property: recording; marketable record title; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 1945 PA 200 (MCL 565.104).
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Hauck [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 235'22 |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2022 04:14 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/13/2022 02:12 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 10:54 Am |
2022-12-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 525 Yeas 30 Nays 0 Excused 6 Not Voting 2 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-09-28 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 460 Yeas 101 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | House | Amended |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/08/2022 |
2022-09-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-09-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-09-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |