MI HB6360 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 510'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 510'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; requirement to provide policy information to department of health and human services; remove sunset. Amends sec. 3101a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3101a).
Title
Insurance; no-fault; requirement to provide policy information to department of health and human services; remove sunset. Amends sec. 3101a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3101a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 869 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 776 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 776 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 510'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 1:30 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:43 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:58 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 869 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-12-11 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 776 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-09-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/25/2018 |
2018-09-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-09-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Edward Canfield |
Subjects
Insurance: no-fault
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): state