MI HB6232 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 222'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 222'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; school; school district changing school board elections to general November election; allow if current school board elections held at odd year general election. Amends sec. 642a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.642a).
Title
Elections; school; school district changing school board elections to general November election; allow if current school board elections held at odd year general election. Amends sec. 642a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.642a).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-15 | Assigned Pa 222'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/10/2010 @ 1:02 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Approved By The Governor 12/10/2010 @ 12:20 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To The Governor 12/8/2010 @ 2:49 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Roll Call # 553 Yeas 100 Nays 0 | |
2010-12-02 | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-12-02 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-12-02 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-12-02 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment | |
2010-12-02 | Title Amended | |
2010-12-02 | Passed Roll Call # 608 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-02 | Substitute S-1 Adopted | |
2010-12-02 | Vote Reconsidered | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 588 Yeas 32 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 1 | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2010-11-30 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-07-01 | Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight | |
2010-06-30 | Transmitted | |
2010-06-30 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 Yeas 107 Nays 0 | |
2010-06-30 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-23 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-06-02 | Printed Bill Filed 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2010-06-01 | Read A First Time | |
2010-06-01 | Introduced By Representative Andy Neumann |
Same As/Similar To
SB1342 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Referred To Committee On Campaign And Election Oversight