MI HB6214 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: diseases; warning notice issued to individuals who are health threats to others; require department or local health department to notify legislature after issuance of notice. Amends secs. 5203 & 5209 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.5203 & 333.5209).
Title
Health: diseases; warning notice issued to individuals who are health threats to others; require department or local health department to notify legislature after issuance of notice. Amends secs. 5203 & 5209 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.5203 & 333.5209).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 424 Yeas 61 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 10 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-06-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/09/2022 |
2022-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |
Subjects
Health: diseases
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services