MI HB6151 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Drains; other; public notice of drain projects; revise for meeting to review apportionments. Amends sec. 154 of 1956 PA 40 (MCL 280.154).
Title
Drains; other; public notice of drain projects; revise for meeting to review apportionments. Amends sec. 154 of 1956 PA 40 (MCL 280.154).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 751 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 751 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-08-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |
Subjects
Communications: Internet
Communications: newspapers and magazines
Drains: districts
Drains: maintenance and improvement
Drains: other
Drains: water management districts
Communications: newspapers and magazines
Drains: districts
Drains: maintenance and improvement
Drains: other
Drains: water management districts