MI HB6144 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-07 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking
Pending: Senate Insurance And Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-07 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking
Pending: Senate Insurance And Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: life; gift limit for life insurance producers; modify. Amends sec. 2024a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2024a).
Title
Insurance: life; gift limit for life insurance producers; modify. Amends sec. 2024a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2024a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 (Y: 83 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Banking |
2022-06-30 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 Yeas 83 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-05-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2022 |
2022-05-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2022-05-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |