MI HB6123 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 509'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 509'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Water; conservation; water use advisory council; create.
Title
Water; conservation; water use advisory council; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 959 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 632 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 632 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 509'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 1:28 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:41 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:28 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 959 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-11-27 | House | Transmitted |
2018-11-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 632 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-08 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2018-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2018-06-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |
Subjects
Environmental protection: other
Natural resources: Great Lakes
Natural resources: inland lakes
Natural resources: other
Natural resources: rivers and streams
Water: conservation
Natural resources: Great Lakes
Natural resources: inland lakes
Natural resources: other
Natural resources: rivers and streams
Water: conservation