MI HB6075 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 530'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 530'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; investments; reporting requirements of a local unit of government retirement system; expand. Amends secs. 13 & 20h of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133 & 38.1140h).
Title
Retirement; investments; reporting requirements of a local unit of government retirement system; expand. Amends secs. 13 & 20h of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133 & 38.1140h).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 788 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 608 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 608 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 530'16 |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2017 @ 12:08 Pm |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/5/2017 @ 4:48 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 1:22 Pm |
2016-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 788 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-08 | House | Passed Roll Call # 608 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Amended |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-12-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/30/2016 |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Dan Lauwers |
Subjects
Local government: other
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: health benefits
Retirement: investments
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: health benefits
Retirement: investments