MI HB6060 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Marihuana: other; marihuana tax revenue; allocate to Indian tribes under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 14 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27964).
Title
Marihuana: other; marihuana tax revenue; allocate to Indian tribes under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 14 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27964).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 395 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 395 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/28/2022 |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-04-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-04-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Yousef Rabhi |