MI HB6024 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 406'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 406'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; special assessments; essential services assessment; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Property tax; special assessments; essential services assessment; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1077 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 855 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 933 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 696 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 855 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 933 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 696 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | House | Assigned Pa 406'12 |
2012-12-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2012 @ 2:20 Pm |
2012-12-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 10:23 Am |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/19/2012 @ 11:10 Am |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1077 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-13 | House | Retransmitted |
2012-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 855 Yeas 57 Nays 52 |
2012-12-13 | House | Amended |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Amended |
2012-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Title Amendment |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 933 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2012-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed Roll Call # 696 Yeas 57 Nays 52 |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-11-27 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/09/2012 |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Jud Gilbert |
Same As/Similar To
SB1364 (Same As) 2012-11-08 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Subjects
Labor, public service employment
Law enforcement, fire personnel
Law enforcement, local police
Property tax, special assessments
Law enforcement, fire personnel
Law enforcement, local police
Property tax, special assessments