MI HB5953 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Children; protection; reporting death of a newborn after surrender to a newborn safety device; expand. Amends sec. 2843 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2843). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5750'18

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; protection; reporting death of a newborn after surrender to a newborn safety device; expand. Amends sec. 2843 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2843). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5750'18

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 889 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28HouseVetoed By The Governor 12/27/2018
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:18 Pm
2018-12-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-20HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-18SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-18SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 889 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-12-18SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-18SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-09-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-09-25SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-09-25SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-05-17SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services
2018-05-16HouseTransmitted
2018-05-16HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 Yeas 96 Nays 12
2018-05-16HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-15HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-15HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-10HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-05-10HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/09/2018
2018-05-09HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2018-05-09HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-09HouseIntroduced By Representative Bronna Kahle

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5953
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5953.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5953.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5953.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5953.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-10-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-16-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-09-25-065.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-18-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback