MI HB5943 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health: pharmaceuticals; health care false claim act; modify exemption from criminal liability to exclude manufacturers of prescription drugs from providing discounts under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2 & 4e of 1984 PA 323 (MCL 752.1002 & 752.1004a).
Title
Health: pharmaceuticals; health care false claim act; modify exemption from criminal liability to exclude manufacturers of prescription drugs from providing discounts under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2 & 4e of 1984 PA 323 (MCL 752.1002 & 752.1004a).
Sponsors
Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Ben Frederick [R] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Frank Liberati [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-07-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/21/2020 |
2020-07-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-07-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-07-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5943 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5943.htm |