MI HB5934 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 220'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 220'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; medical services; rural hospital access pool; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 110a.
Title
Human services; medical services; rural hospital access pool; provide for. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 110a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 515 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 442 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 442 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 220'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2018 @ 1:50 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:50 Pm |
2018-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 515 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-06-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 442 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/20/2018 @ 2:30 Pm |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-05-15 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Wittenberg |
Subjects
Health facilities: hospitals
Human services: medical services
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Human services: medical services
State agencies (existing): health and human services