MI HB5872 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax: exemptions; industrial processing exemption; clarify. Amends sec. 4t of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54t). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5255'21
Title
Sales tax: exemptions; industrial processing exemption; clarify. Amends sec. 4t of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54t). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5255'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/03/2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-03-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Hall |