MI HB5829 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-23 - Printed Bill Filed 09/19/2014
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-23 - Printed Bill Filed 09/19/2014
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; security guards; certain training of security guards; require. Amends 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.101 - 339.2677) by adding sec. 1439. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5828'14, SB 0983'14
Title
Occupations; security guards; certain training of security guards; require. Amends 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.101 - 339.2677) by adding sec. 1439. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5828'14, SB 0983'14
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/19/2014 |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-09-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Stallworth |
Same As/Similar To
SB0983 (Same As) 2014-12-04 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Subjects
Occupations, business licensing and regulation
Occupations, security guards
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, security guards
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-HB-5829 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2014-HIB-5829.htm |