MI HB5776 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; written parental consent to place student in a classroom with a teacher rated ineffective on most recent year-end evaluation; require. Amends secs. 1249 & 1249a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1249 & 380.1249a).
Title
Education; school districts; written parental consent to place student in a classroom with a teacher rated ineffective on most recent year-end evaluation; require. Amends secs. 1249 & 1249a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1249 & 380.1249a).
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Rep. Shanelle Jackson [D] | Sen. Margaret O'Brien [R] | Rep. Mark Ouimet [R] |
Rep. Maureen Stapleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 705 (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2012-12-06 | House | Rep. David Rutledge Phil Cavanagh[*] Removed As Co-sponsor |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed Roll Call # 705 Yeas 60 Nays 49 |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-08-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/19/2012 |
2012-07-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-07-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-07-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Maureen Stapleton |