MI HB5765 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-29 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-29 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; restricted driver license for individuals convicted of the offense of moving violation causing death; allow. Amends sec. 319 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.319).
Title
Traffic control; violations; restricted driver license for individuals convicted of the offense of moving violation causing death; allow. Amends sec. 319 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.319).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 642 (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-11-28 | House | Transmitted |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 642 Yeas 89 Nays 20 |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-04-24 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/10/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-04-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Curt Vanderwall |