MI HB5734 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed On Order Of General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: construction and repair; use of certain traffic control devices when closing a freeway or portion of freeway; require under certain conditions. Amends sec. 1 of 1917 PA 165 (MCL 247.291) & adds secs. 1a & 1b.
Title
Highways: construction and repair; use of certain traffic control devices when closing a freeway or portion of freeway; require under certain conditions. Amends sec. 1 of 1917 PA 165 (MCL 247.291) & adds secs. 1a & 1b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 (Y: 98 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-05-25 | House | Transmitted |
2022-05-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 Yeas 98 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-05-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-24 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-05-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2022-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/10/2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2022-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |