MI HB5732 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Assigned Pa 190'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Assigned Pa 190'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: tax; certain revenue from liquor control tax; redirect to the secondary road patrol and training fund. Amends sec. 1201 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.2201).
Title
Liquor: tax; certain revenue from liquor control tax; redirect to the secondary road patrol and training fund. Amends sec. 1201 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.2201).
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] | Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. TC Clements [R] | Sen. John Damoose [R] |
Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] | Sen. Roger Hauck [R] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. David Martin [R] |
Rep. Jewell Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 384 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | House | Assigned Pa 190'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-09-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/27/2022 01:32 Pm |
2022-09-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 09/27/2022 10:04 Am |
2022-09-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/26/2022 02:53 Pm |
2022-09-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-21 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 384 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-21 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-09-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-09-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-04-13 | House | Transmitted |
2022-04-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 158 Yeas 91 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-04-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-04-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-04-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/10/2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2022-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Tommy Brann |