MI HB5714 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 493'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 493'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; carriers; motor carrier act; modify procedure for issuance of authority and other general revisions. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4, art. I, heading & secs. 1, 3, 5, 8, 9, 10, 13 & 14, art. II, heading & secs. 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 9, 11 & 12, art. III, secs. 1 & 2, art. IV, secs. 2, 5, 6, 6a, 6b, 7, 8, 9 10, 10a, 11, 14, 14a & 18, art. V & sec. 2, art. VI of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 475.1 et seq.); adds secs. 4a, 7, 7a, 7b & 9a to art. III & repeals sec. 5, art. I, secs. 4, 6, 7, 7a, 7b, 7c & 11, art. II, sec. 5a, art. III, sec. 1a, art. IV, sec. 4, art. V & sec. 3, art. VI of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 475.5 et seq.).
Title
Transportation; carriers; motor carrier act; modify procedure for issuance of authority and other general revisions. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4, art. I, heading & secs. 1, 3, 5, 8, 9, 10, 13 & 14, art. II, heading & secs. 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 9, 11 & 12, art. III, secs. 1 & 2, art. IV, secs. 2, 5, 6, 6a, 6b, 7, 8, 9 10, 10a, 11, 14, 14a & 18, art. V & sec. 2, art. VI of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 475.1 et seq.); adds secs. 4a, 7, 7a, 7b & 9a to art. III & repeals sec. 5, art. I, secs. 4, 6, 7, 7a, 7b, 7c & 11, art. II, sec. 5a, art. III, sec. 1a, art. IV, sec. 4, art. V & sec. 3, art. VI of 1933 PA 254 (MCL 475.5 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 809 (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 881 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 532 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 881 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 532 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 493'14 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/13/2015 @ 3:58 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 12:54 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/8/2015 @ 11:26 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 809 Yeas 98 Nays 12 |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 881 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2014-10-02 | House | Transmitted |
2014-10-02 | House | Passed Roll Call # 532 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2014-10-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-10-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-08-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/31/2014 |
2014-07-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2014-07-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-07-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |