MI HB5684 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 550'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 550'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Drains; districts; acquisitions of interests in real or personal property by a drainage district; authorize. Amends sec. 5 of 1956 PA 40 (MCL 280.5).
Title
Drains; districts; acquisitions of interests in real or personal property by a drainage district; authorize. Amends sec. 5 of 1956 PA 40 (MCL 280.5).
Sponsors
Rep. Alton Pscholka [R] | Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Bill LaVoy [D] | Rep. Scott Dianda [D] |
Rep. Joe Haveman [R] | Rep. Frank Foster [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 851 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 850 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 850 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 550'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 11:35 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:34 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/7/2015 @ 12:00 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 851 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 850 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 2 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2014-11-13 | House | Transmitted |
2014-11-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 Yeas 103 Nays 3 |
2014-11-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-11-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-11-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-11-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-07-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/13/2014 |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Al Pscholka |