MI HB5595 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 253'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 253'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; weights and measures; uniform standards and regulations; modify. Amends secs. 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 9a & 9b of 1964 PA 283 (MCL 290.602 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5596'12
Title
Agriculture; weights and measures; uniform standards and regulations; modify. Amends secs. 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 9a & 9b of 1964 PA 283 (MCL 290.602 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5596'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 504 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | House | Assigned Pa 253'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/2/2012 @ 3:45 Pm |
2012-07-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/26/2012 @ 8:08 Am |
2012-07-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/22/2012 @ 11:22 Am |
2012-06-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 504 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2012-05-23 | House | Transmitted |
2012-05-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-05-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-22 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-05-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/04/2012 |
2012-05-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2012-05-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Charles Brunner |