MI HB5591 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Assigned Pa 157'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; appraisers; time period for filing a complaint against a licensee for certain violations; modify. Amends sec. 2635 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2635).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; appraisers; time period for filing a complaint against a licensee for certain violations; modify. Amends sec. 2635 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2635).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseAssigned Pa 157'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-05-23HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 5/23/2018 @ 2:32 Pm
2018-05-23HouseApproved By The Governor 5/23/2018 @ 12:48 Pm
2018-05-22HousePresented To The Governor 5/21/2018 @ 12:54 Pm
2018-05-16HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-05-16HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-05-16HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-05-16SenateInserted Full Title
2018-05-16SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-05-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-05-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-05-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-05-10SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-10SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-03-15SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-03-14HouseTransmitted
2018-03-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-03-14HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-13HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-03-13HouseRead A Second Time
2018-03-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-02-20HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/15/2018
2018-02-15HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-02-15HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced By Representative Brandt Iden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5591
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5591.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5591.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5591.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5591.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0157.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-07-025.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-14-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-10-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-16-049.htm

Bill Comments

feedback