MI HB5574 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 188'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 188'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; funds; budget stabilization fund distribution; provide for. Amends sec. 358 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1358).
Title
State financing and management; funds; budget stabilization fund distribution; provide for. Amends sec. 358 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1358).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 188'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/20/2014 @ 3:54 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/20/2014 @ 10:52 Am |
2014-06-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/10/2014 @ 11:34 Am |
2014-06-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-03 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-03 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 Yeas 74 Nays 36 |
2014-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-22 | House | Amended |
2014-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Detroit's Recovery And Michigan's Future |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Stallworth |