MI HB5573 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Assigned Pa 118'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Assigned Pa 118'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Townships; ordinances; provision regarding controlling or eradicating noxious weeds; eliminate population requirement. Amends sec. 4 of 1941 PA 359 (MCL 247.64).
Title
Townships; ordinances; provision regarding controlling or eradicating noxious weeds; eliminate population requirement. Amends sec. 4 of 1941 PA 359 (MCL 247.64).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Assigned Pa 118'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-07-21 | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/13/2010 @ 11:02 Am | |
2010-07-21 | Approved By The Governor 7/13/2010 @ 9:38 Am | |
2010-07-01 | Presented To The Governor 7/1/2010 @ 3:56 Pm | |
2010-06-30 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-06-30 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-30 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 339 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-06-24 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-06-24 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-05-04 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted | |
2010-04-29 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 162 Yeas 106 Nays 0 | |
2010-04-29 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-04-29 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-29 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-01-26 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-01-26 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-11-04 | Printed Bill Filed 11/04/2009 | |
2009-11-03 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2009-11-03 | Read A First Time | |
2009-11-03 | Introduced By Representative James Bolger |