MI HB5558 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; commercial hunting guides; provide for. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding secs. 43528c & 43528d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5560'19, HB 5559'19
Title
Natural resources; hunting; commercial hunting guides; provide for. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding secs. 43528c & 43528d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5560'19, HB 5559'19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/03/2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2020-02-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5558 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5558.htm |