MI HB5536 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 210'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Veterans; other; county veteran service fund; create, and provide for funding and expenditures. Amends title of 1953 PA 192 (MCL 35.621 - 35.624) & adds sec. 3a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans; other; county veteran service fund; create, and provide for funding and expenditures. Amends title of 1953 PA 192 (MCL 35.621 - 35.624) & adds sec. 3a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 514 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15HouseAssigned Pa 210'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-08-15HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/26/2018 @ 1:30 Pm
2018-08-15HouseApproved By The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:42 Pm
2018-08-15HousePresented To The Governor 6/20/2018 @ 1:56 Pm
2018-06-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-06-12House Roll Call # 514 Yeas 108 Nays 1
2018-06-12HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-06-12HouseRule Suspended
2018-06-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-06-12HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect
2018-06-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-06-12SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-06-12SenateRules Suspended
2018-06-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-06-12SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-06-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-06-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-06-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-06-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-03-15SenateReferred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security
2018-03-14HouseTransmitted
2018-03-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-03-14HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-13HouseAmended
2018-03-13HouseRead A Second Time
2018-03-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-03-06HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2018-02-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/08/2018
2018-02-08HouseReferred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs
2018-02-08HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced By Representative Jason Wentworth

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5536
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5536.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5536.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5536.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5536.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0210.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-06-024.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-14-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-06-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-12-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback