MI HB5519 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund; insulin production program; include in report of activities. Amends sec. 9 of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2009). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4890'23
Title
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund; insulin production program; include in report of activities. Amends sec. 9 of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2009). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4890'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-05-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/22/2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2024-02-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Jennifer Conlin |
Same As/Similar To
HB4890 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - Referred To Second Reading